Trustees DORSET MEMORY BOX LIBRARY
Charity number: 1058767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Clive Briney | Chair | 25 August 2010 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elizabeth Bristow | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Barbara Helms | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jean Thorne | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEN CHEESLEY | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDY COLLIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BRINEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORDON BARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN CAMP | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.