Trustees LABRADOR RESCUE SOUTH EAST AND CENTRAL
Charity number: 1059122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD BEST | Chair | 29 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Agnes Annie Miller | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK DYER | Trustee | 29 October 2012 |
|
|||||
MARK MIDDLETON-SMITH | Trustee | 29 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNA WILES | Trustee | 12 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR NUTKINS | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN STOCKS | Trustee | 12 March 1998 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MEGAN STEVENS | Trustee | 12 March 1977 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.