Charity overview THE SUNDAY SCHOOL AND TRUST PROPERTY (HORSEBRIDGE HILL)
Charity number: 232332-5
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 17 FEBRUARY 1885 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 22 APRIL 1910,20TH JANUARY 1965 AND 26TH MAY 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION AND EDUCATION OF POOR CHILDREN BELONGING TO THE CONGREGATION AND SUCH OTHER CHILDREN AS THE TRUSTEES SELECT AND FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SELECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 21 January 1966: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.