GIDLEIGH VILLAGE HALL CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall available to local people for functions, weddings etc. Also available to people from further afield for art groups and workshops and other bookings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £10,667 from 2 government grant(s)
People
5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 22 December 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Reiss | Chair | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Hardy | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hatt Reiss | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Rowe-Leete | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Crowley | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.75k | £18.54k | £12.53k | £12.29k | £32.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.80k | £29.06k | £9.68k | £9.02k | £21.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.78k | £10.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 145 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 145 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 26 June 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 29TH MARCH, 1961
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF VILLAGE HALL FOR RECREATIONAL CLUB.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF GIDLEIGH AND THROWLEIGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gidleigh Village Hall
Gidleigh
Chagford
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ13 8HR
- Phone:
- 00000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window