Trustees THE LUTON WAR MEMORIAL FUND
Charity number: 200608
Charity reporting is overdue by 273 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Sargent Mr | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Parker | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Milne | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Sullivan | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR THOMAS SHAW | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR TERRY HENNESSEY | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Kyne | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GILMOUR | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|||||
ALLAN OLIVER | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR DON TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.