Accounts and annual returns POOR'S LANDS AND TRYON CHARITIES
Charity number: 201000
Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 838 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 04 May 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 04 May 2021 | 399 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window