Charity overview WEAVERS' ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 245453-18
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 3 NOVEMBER 1908, DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 OCTOBER 1965, AND SCHEME DATED 24 OCTOBER 1968.
Charitable objects
1) PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS. 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 21 OF SCHEME FOR QUALIFICATION OF ALMSPEOPLE)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
- 01 January 1969: Standard registration
- 10 January 1995: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.