Trustees MALVERN WELLS VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 206763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL GEORGE JACKSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Jean Williams | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Ken Beecroft | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR Nick Merriman | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jim Black | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN ROBERT BURRAGE | Trustee | 12 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARTHUR WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOREEN GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.