Governing document THE DOUGLAS HAIG MEMORIAL HOMES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST 17 JAN 1929, SCHEMES OF 7 JAN 1997, 22 JAN 1997 AND S74(2)(A) RESOLUTION DATED 9 NOV 1999, SCHEMES OF 24 MAY 2001, 25 MARCH 2003, 7 APRIL 2003, 6 OCT 2004 & 2 JUNE 2005. SCHEME AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE HOUSING ASSISTANCE FOR THE FOLLOWING PERSONS : (A) MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE NAVAL MILITARY AND AIR FORCES AND RESERVE FORCES OF THE CROWN, MERCHANT NAVY AND FISHING FLEETS PROVIDED THEY ARE SERVING OR HAVE/SHALL HAVE SERVED AFLOAT DURING HOSTILITIES OUTSIDE EXAMINATION AREAS. (B) WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS CHILDREN OR OTHER DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE NAVAL MILITARY AND AIR FORCES AND RESERVE FORCES OF THE CROWN AND OF THE MERCHANT NAVY AND FISHING FLEETS PROVIDED THAT SUCH LAST-MENTIONED MEMBERS HAVE/SHALL HAVE SERVED AS AFORESAID. (C) WIVES HUSBANDS CHILDREN OR OTHER DEPENDENTS OF LIVING MEMBERS OF THE NAVAL MILITARY AND AIR FORCES AND RESERVE FORCES OF THE CROWN AND MEMBERS OF THE MERCHANT NAVY AND FISHING FLEETS PROVIDED THAT SUCH LAST-MENTIONED MEMBERS ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.