Governing document THE GUEST HOUSE, LINGFIELD
Charity number: 207424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF ARTHUR BALDWIN HAYWARD PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY ON THE 31ST AUGUST 1954 AND SCHEMES OF 21ST MAY 1982, 11TH MARCH 1983, 29TH JULY 1993 AND 20TH NOVEMBER 1995 AND 23RD MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF GUEST HOUSE AS LIBRARY AND MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LINGFIELD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.