Trustees NORTH HALL
Charity number: 207700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denis Kelvin Cook | Chair | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Louise Speirs | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Cook | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth anne Lancaster | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Devon Seymour | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Victor Robinson | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON DOMINIC BATES | Trustee | 07 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MOORE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.