Governing document VILLAGE HALL (RINGMER)
Charity number: 207885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 21 JUNE 1960, ORDER DATED 10 JUNE 2005 AND RESOLUTION DATED 28 NOVEMBER 2005, 31 MARCH 2008 AND 25 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE OF THE VICAR OF RINGMER ON SUNDAYS, CHRISTMAS DAY & GOOD FRIDAY & SUBJECT THERETO FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANT'S WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF RINGMER.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.