Trustees FRIENDS OF SHERBORNE ABBEY
Charity number: 208584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Martin Paul Lee | Chair | 16 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Charles Mitchell-Innes Mitchell-Innes | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Clare Foster Henderson | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bill John McDermott | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jane Leavey | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David George Ferguson | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Louise Nelson | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Prout | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hamon | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN RODD | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|||||
FRANCES GOMME-DUNCAN | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FRANCIS BUNNELL | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE SUSAN BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE KEATINGE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.