Governing document J E JOSEPH CHARITABLE FUND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL AND CODICIL PROVED ON 29 AUGUST 1946 AND SCHEMES OF 16 JULY 1956, 17 APRIL 1961, 24 OCTOBER 1972 AND 11 MAY 1977. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITIES NAMELY:- A) RELIEF OF POVERTY. B) RELIEF OF AFFLICTIONS OR SUFFERING OF POOR JEWS. C) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. D) ADVANCEMENT OF JEWISH RELIGION. E) OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE JEWISH COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.