Governing document PARKHAVEN TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MAY 1940 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 17/06/1948, 19/10/1971, 27/09/1989, 28/09/1994, 23/06/1999, 22/09/08 & BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 2 FEBRUARY 1998 as amended on 30 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF OLDER PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH EPILEPSY, LEARNING, PHYSICAL AND OTHER DISABILITIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING BY THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY HOMES, RESIDENTIAL CARE, NURSING HOME CARE AND A RANGE OF DAY AND DOMICILIARY CARE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.