Trustees WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - ST AGNES
Charity number: 213434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Vasey | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Ripper | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gail McCloy | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Moore | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Yvonne Johnson | Trustee | 19 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julia Dodson | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Sutton | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Holton | Trustee | 17 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Bailey | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAWN BROWN | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
HILARY GRACE NANKIVELL | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.