Trustees ELKESLEY MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 214429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hew Rowley Male | Chair | 22 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Gilson | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Wright | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Oldbury | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Bragg | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Savill Female | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robbie May Male | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.