Trustees THE WESTON LONGVILLE, MORTON ON THE HILL AND ATTLEBRIDGE HALL FOR ALL
Charity number: 214942
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mark Howey | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nickolas Vignir Barber | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Dawn Rayner | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Cowley | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Smith | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janice May Richardson | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Miriam Rutterford | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Carter | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA FURNESS | Trustee | 22 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PARSONS | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR SMITH | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ELIZABETH GOODALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.