Accounts and annual returns THE LLANGARRON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 223228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 February 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2021 | 30 May 2022 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2020 | 30 May 2022 | 532 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2019 | 30 May 2022 | 898 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window