Trustees CONGREGATION OF THE MISSIONARY OBLATES OF THE MOST HOLY AND IMMACULATE VIRGIN MARY (OBLATES OF MARY IMMACULATE)
Charity number: 223318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Leo Philomin | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Fitzpatrick OMI | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Irvin Morastil OMI | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lorcan O'Reilly OMI | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gerard Oliver Barry OMI | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Oblates of Mary Immaculate | Trustee | 15 September 1997 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.