Trustees HYDE WAR MEMORIAL TRUST (LOWER HIGHAM FARM)
Charity number: 228670
Charity reporting is up to date (136 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Durkin | Chair | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carole Longson | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phil Chadwick | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rilly Shibley Alam | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EKIN | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Plackett | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Bell | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ellis | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Halliday | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Richardson | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Betty Affleck | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER AINGER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.