Linked charities CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF THE FINDING OF JESUS IN THE TEMPLE
Charity number: 229049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED WITH CODICIL THERETO IN P.P.R. ON 9/3/1932 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 10/05/1982, AND SCHEME OF 16 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
NURSING AND CONVALESCENT HOME AND ANY RELIGIOUS PURPOSE CONNECTED WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
- 28 January 1964 : Standard registration
- 27 February 1995 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.