Trustees SCALEBY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 229364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Andrew Edgar | Chair | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Alcock | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Susan Alcock | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Hogg | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Fell | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Carlyle | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Scott | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Utting | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Terry Moore | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Margaret Pritchard | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Moore | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Margaret Grieve | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.