Trustees WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - WYKE REGIS
Charity number: 229425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL AVRIL PEARCE | Chair | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Rose Gaskell-Sinclair | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARIA JANICE FENTIMAN | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN MARGARET STAGLES | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARION ALICE PERING | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANN MAY | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN MARY REEVES | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH FRANCESCA COOPER | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE FLEMING | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANNE FRANCES LESLIE | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Boswell | Trustee | 13 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE NORTH | Trustee | 13 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Seaward | Trustee | 13 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY RANSON | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.