Trustees THE HEWORTH MOOR HOUSE TRUST
Charity number: 230045
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Elliott | Chair | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maren Krumdieck | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dinah Leonard | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Halstead | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jane Hicks | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Janet Schofield | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Judith Hodgson | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LANGLEY | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mary Lister | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.