Trustees ROYAL COLLEGE OF VETERINARY SURGEONS TRUST
Charity number: 230886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Susan Paterson FRCVS | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abbie Larissa Calow MRCVS | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melissa Anne Donald BVMS MRCVS | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Louise Bawn | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Terence Mark Knight | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Victoria Goodwin MRCVS | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Branscombe RVN | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Charlotte Cartlidge RVN | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Karen Coe MRCVS | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN HENRY POUND | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.