Governing document THE FRANCIS W RECKITT ARTS TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/09/1929 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01/08/1958 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10/03/2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG ARTISTS BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE ARTISTS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE TO ACCESS FACILITIES AND/OR SUITABLE ACCOMMODATION TO ENABLE THEM TO PRACTICE THEIR PROFESSION SO AS TO BRING THEMSELVES OUT OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND/OR POVERTY; (2) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION TO BE SECURED FOR ARTISTS IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE WHO ARE RECOVERING FROM ILLNESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.