Linked charities CONGREGATIONAL UNITED CHARITIES
Charity number: 232332
Charity reporting is up to date (197 days late)
Linked charities
- CONGREGATIONAL CHAPEL AND TRUST
- CONGREGATIONAL CHAPEL BUILDING (NODEHILL OR UPPER ST JAMES STREET)
- EDWARD COOKE
- MRS MARY A MITCHELL
- MRS MORTON (OTHERWISE MOORE)
- STEPHEN DAY'S ENDOWMENT FOR MINISTER
- SUNDAY SCHOOL AND TRUST PROPERTY IN NODEHILL
- THE SCHOOL BUILDINGS AND TRUST
- THE SUNDAY SCHOOL AND TRUST PROPERTY (HORSEBRIDGE HILL)
Governing document
SCHEME OF 17 FEBRUARY 1885 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 22 APRIL 1910,20TH JANUARY 1965 AND 26TH MAY 1993
Charitable objects
FOR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 21 January 1966 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.