Governing document ROYAL NATIONAL MISSION TO DEEP SEA FISHERMEN
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION DATED 25TH MAY 1887 ADOPTED 23RD MAY 1954 AS AMENDED 8TH DECEMBER 1966, 22ND OCTOBER 1980, 25TH APRIL 1990, 21ST NOVEMBER 1990, 18TH DECEMBER 1996 AND 7 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 MAY 2016 as amended on 27 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A PRESENCE IN BRITISH ISLES FISHING PORTS WHERE FISHERMEN AND THEIR FAMILIES CAN RECEIVE SPIRITUAL AND MATERIAL HELP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.