Governing document THE LUXFORD CENTRE
Charity number: 233601
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1962, AS AMENDED 12 SEPTEMBER 1995, 10 MAY 1997, 11 MAY 2002 AND 10 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE TOWN OF UCKFIELD AND THE PARISHES OF MARESFIELD, BUXTED, FRAMFIELD, LITTLE HORSTED, AND ISFIELD
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UCKFIELD, AND PARISHES OF MARESFIELD, BUXTED, FRAMFIELD, LITTLE HORSTED, AND ISFIELD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.