Trustees IFORD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (TRUST FUNDS AND PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION THEREWITH)
Charity number: 234230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eluned Pickup Mrs | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Richards | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Attie Jansen | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Olwen Lesley Adams | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOMONIQUE BROWN | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA AVRIL MCCARRON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH JANE BARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN GEORGE PICKUP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SEAN COLIN BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.