Governing document THE ARTHUR NORFOLK BATTERSBY TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 04/08/1955, DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/07/1966, SCHEME DATED 26/08/1976 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/01/2014 as amended on 10 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING A HOME OR REST HOME FOR AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER AND DESERVING OF ASSISTANCE WHO RESIDE WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF STOCKPORT OR WITHIN SUCH A REASONABLE DISTANCE FROM THE STOCKPORT TOWN HALL AS MAY BE DETERMINED BY TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
STOCKPORT AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.