Trustees ST ANDREW'S BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 236198
Charity reporting is overdue by 260 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Easton | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Macdonald | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemairi Evison | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Janette Walls | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Craig Bowman | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Alan Walls | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER SAINT | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Betty Ntow-Aninkora | Trustee | 26 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Sheila May | Trustee | 26 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laura Barker | Trustee | 26 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Philip Dickinson | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.