Trustees MARHAM POOR'S ALLOTMENT
Charity number: 236402
Charity reporting is overdue by 159 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY CALEY | Chair | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Callaby Callaby | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Greene Greene | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tony Harrison | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robin Steeles | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JODIE THOMAS CALEY | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN NUDD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ERIC WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.