Governing document The Penn and Smith Almshouses
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 11 NOVEMBER 1955 AND 7 DECEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2023 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 MAY 2024 as amended on 12 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALMSPEOPLE BEING POOR PERSONS OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE, AND OF GOOD CHARACTER, WHO FROM AGE, ILL-HEALTH, ACCIDENT OR INFIRMITY ARE UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES BY THEIR OWN EXERTIONS, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE ANCIENT PARISHES OF GREENWICH, DEPTFORD AND LEWISHAM FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF GREENWICH, DEPTFORD AND LEWISHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.