Trustees THE ODIHAM CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Charity number: 238310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Nichols | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Verdon | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Anthony Robinson-Giannasi | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Tunstell | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher Dudgeon | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Michael Brooks | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Barnacle | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Rolfe | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Elaine Weaver | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Lancaster | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Love | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
TOM BENFORD | Trustee | 16 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEIL OSMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE BLAY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN CHAMPION | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.