Accounts and annual returns MANSFIELD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS
Charity number: 239214
Charity reporting is overdue by 1471 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 October 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 10 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 10 days | |
Annual return | 06 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 376 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 376 days | |
Annual return | 06 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 741 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 741 days | |
Annual return | 06 October 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1106 days | |
Annual return | 06 October 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1471 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1471 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window