Trustees THE WAR MEMORIAL VILLAGE - DERBY
Charity number: 241516
Charity reporting is up to date (113 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARVEY JENNINGS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Glynn Kearney | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Smale | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ross McCristal | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
NORMA BRACEWELL | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WALL MBE | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DOYLE | Trustee | 27 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MEL MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN JENNINGS TD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.