Trustees FRERE'S ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 247354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFF DANDO | Chair | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Reade | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Barbara Langley | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thomas Blackmore | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Bell | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HAWKING | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR JOHN DUGAY | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev JEREMY ANDREW | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.