Governing document CEREBRAL PALSY - MID STAFFORDSHIRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 1957 AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 FEBRUARY 1969 AND SCHEME DATED 14 FEBRUARY 1977 FURTHER AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 1995, 8 OCTOBER 1997, 8 OCTOBER 2003 AND 3 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES AND PURPOSES ONLY AND FOR THE CARE, WELFARE, INTEREST, TREATMENT, EDUCATION, AND ADVANCEMENT OF PERSONS WITH ANY FORM OF CEREBRAL PALSY OR WITH A RELATED DISABILITY, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.