Trustees STEPNEY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity number: 250130
Charity reporting is overdue by 70 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN HORLOR | Chair | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Kershaw Ms | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shuhel Malique | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Abdul Wahid | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Buckman | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darren Williams | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Fearon | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER YEATMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila McQuade | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.