Trustees THE ROYAL CORNWALL AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 250312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
76 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Brian Grigg | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Fiona Ann James | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Shute | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
James Andrew Eustice | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel Paul Rodda | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Claire Eustice | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Charles Perceval Phillips | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Derek Parsons | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Mary Eustice | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Stephen Blumenau | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Vanessa Stanbury | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Fiona Ham | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Biddick | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Trezise | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Charles Paul Richards | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Peter John Olds | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Geoffrey James | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Mead OBE DL | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
ROLAND DAVID NANCEKIVELL | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Vivenne Grace Daniel | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Shirley Borton | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL PETER ROBERTS | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JULIAN STANBURY | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH ANNE BOWDEN | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIP EDWARD ROOSE | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Charles Brewer | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
GEORGE BLIGHT | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
ERIC GEORGE SLEEP | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Alan Edmond | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sharon Mary Dudden | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
EDWARD GRENFELL BAILEY | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Alexandra Bolitho | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Richard Tremayne Willis | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Kelvin Redvers Williams | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
James Walkers | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rodger John Laity | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Frederick John Dyer | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Paul Malcolm Richards | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Richard John Jenkin | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Philip John Laity | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Ernest Bowden | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Alan John Lutey | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Lionel Edmond | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Peter William Hodge | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Mary Thomas | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Adele Jewell | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Coryton | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Stephen Hoskin | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Sir Nicholas Bacon Bt KCVO | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|||||||
Lady St Levan JP DL | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|||||||
ROBERT ANDREW SLOMAN | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
BISHOP TIM THORNTON | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Major Charles Edward-Collins DL | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
COLONEL EDWARD BOLITHO OBE | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|||||||
Alan Snow | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MR TREVOR BURLEY | Trustee | 02 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD HARRY OLDS | Trustee | 02 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES WEST EUSTICE | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL KENNETH JAMES VINCENT | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||
SIR Ferrers Vyvyan BT DL | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Iona Lady Molesworth-St Aubyn DL | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||
LADY CAREW POLE CVO JP | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|||||||
THE RT HON THE LORD ST LEVAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
The Rt Hon The Viscount Falmouth | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SIR RICHARD CAREW POLE BT OBE DL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
James Piran Williams | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Arthur Michael Johnstone Galsworthy CVO CBE DL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR JONATHAN COODE DL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Peter Michael Bickford-Smith | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR MICHAEL WILLIAMS DL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER J N PRIDEAUX-BRUNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BISHOP BILL IND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LADY BANHAM MBE JP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS MARY ANDREW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Nicholas John Trefusis | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
THE EARL PEEL GCVO DL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.