Trustees FORCES WELFARE FUND
Charity number: 250335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Jackman | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Alan Cobain CF | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Lt Col Andrew Ledger OBE | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Alexander Goodwin | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Lt Col Daniel John Rawlins | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Lydia Brown | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Squadron Leader Angela Glasby RAF | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Christopher Shimmen | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Group Captain Michael Geoffrey Oldham | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Stephen Robbins | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Lt Col Mark John Robert Nash | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jane Guyer | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Lt Col Richard Miller | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.