Trustees HIGH HALSTOW RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity number: 250996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PHILIP GILCHRIST MYATT | Chair |
|
||||||
Tamsin Stowers | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Natasha Turner | Trustee | 27 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUNE COLLINS | Trustee | 11 June 2013 |
|
|||||
STUART BAILEY | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PEEK | Trustee | 18 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND STEPHEN GWILT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.