Governing document GLASTONBURY AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY
Charity number: 251140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 23RD FEBRUARY 1966 AS AMENDED BY MINUTES OF MEETING ON THE 23RD NOVEMBER 1981 AMENDED 12 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 27 OCT 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE, ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND ADVANCE RELIGION AMONG THE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
GLASTONBURY AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.