Accounts and annual returns ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES G L E SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 252408
Charity reporting is overdue by 671 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 306 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 671 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | 03 November 2019 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window