Accounts and annual returns POOLE AND EAST DORSET CLUB FOR THE DISABLED INSKIP LEAGUE OF FRIENDSHIP, BRANCH NO 15
Charity number: 255288
Charity reporting is overdue by 1358 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 264 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 264 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 629 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 629 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 994 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 994 days | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1358 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1358 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 02 March 2020 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window