Trustees BARFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity number: 256836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald George Veness | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Scott Warren | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Adam | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Andrew Scott | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Barrott | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Margaret Findlay | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Elizabeth Fraser | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.