Trustees MELBOURNE OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 257243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MIKE MCGHEE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Laura Connolly Mrs | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Walker | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Zahorodnyj LLB Hons | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Blackmore | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rhia Fingerhut | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
GILL MCGHEE | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR ALISON HENSHAW | Trustee |
|
||||||
BARBARA ANN MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN ELIZABETH NEILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT KEITH REAVELEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.