Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST MARK'S HOSPITAL
Charity number: 258233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Mary Evans | Chair | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN PALMER | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kwong Buay Kit | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Northover | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Alan Wraight | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Rodrigues | Trustee | 05 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SOLVEIG WILSON | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Helen Shorter | Trustee | 09 July 2001 |
|
|
||||
JENNY THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNIE DRISCOLL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET HAMMERSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.